Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/28/2017 at 06:19:42 (UTC).

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHCT VS. AUTOBUSES R ETAL ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2009 METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHCT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AUTOBUSES R ETAL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **7281

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AHCT

Defendants

REYES DELIS ETAL

Houston, TX 77086

PORT OF HO AUTHY ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS CTY FLD CD ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

VERDE RAFAEL ETAL

Houston, TX 77088

HARRIS CTY ED ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

VOICESTREAM HO INC*FKA*ET

701 Brazos St #1050

Austin, TX 78701

CAMPA JOSE ETAL

Houston, TX 77006

HOUSTON COMMUN COL S ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

TAX ASSESSOR & CHCT ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

AUTOBUSES R ETAL

530 Lovett Blvd

Houston, TX 77006

T-MOBILE WEST CORP ETAL

701 Brazos St #1050

Austin, TX 78701

HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST ETAL

1001 Preston

Houston, TX 77002

TRANSPORTES RI ETAL

1590 Oakbrook Dr #100

Norcross, GA 30093

GREATER EAST END MD ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

CITY OF HO ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON ISD ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JUNKIN, FREDERICK D

Attorney at ANDREWS & KURTH

600 Travis, Suite 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

COLLMER , MARK WESLEY

Attorney at COLLMER LAW GROUP

1221 Lamar Suite 1302

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #622061 AMT $172.00 PAID BY ANDREWS & KURTH METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUT VS CAMPA JOSE ETAL FILING FEE FOR CONDEMNATION Film code Number 763916790

Original Petition (Filing Fee)

Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN Film code Number 763916791

Order

Order: APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS GRANTED Film code Number 763954627

Oath

Oath: OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 764883229

Amended Event

Amended Event: OF HEARING Film code Number 766823795

Letter

Letter: FROM FREDERICK D JUNKIN Film code Number 766873329

Letter

Letter: FROM FREDRICK D JUNKIN Film code Number 766895571

Statement

Statement: SPECIAL COMNR STATEMENT OF SERV Film code Number 766895565

Order

Order: ORD RECESSING & SCHEDULING RECONVENING OF HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 766873294

Letter

Letter: FROM MICHAEL E DENOSKY Film code Number 784904850

Notice

Notice: OF ORAL HEARING Film code Number 787835786

Letter

Letter: FROM CONRAD B GUTHRIE Film code Number 786993065

Legacy Event

Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&APPL DEFENDANTS MOT & APPL TO WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF CT Film code Number 787835781

Order

Order: ON DEFT JOSE CAMPA AUTOBUSES REGIOMONTANOS TRANSPORTES REGIOMONTANOS INC MOT & APPL TO WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF CT GRANTED Film code Number 787853255

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 788902099

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 788902100

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 788902101

Withdraw

Withdraw: CERT ON CT ORD AUTHY PYMNT OF FUNDS FROM REG CT TO COLLMER LAW GROUP AMT $3707.55 HALL LAW FIRM AMT $1157.55 & JOSE CAMPA AUTOBUSES R&TRLI AMT $4134.90 Film code Number 788924701

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Withdraw: CERT ON CT ORD AUTHY PYMNT OF FUNDS FROM REG CT TO COLLMER LAW GROUP AMT $3707.55 HALL LAW FIRM AMT $1157.55 & JOSE CAMPA AUTOBUSES R&TRLI AMT $4134.90 Film code Number 788924701

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 788902101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 788902100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 788902099

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ON DEFT JOSE CAMPA AUTOBUSES REGIOMONTANOS TRANSPORTES REGIOMONTANOS INC MOT & APPL TO WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF CT GRANTED Film code Number 787853255

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Legacy Event: Legacy events: MOT&APPL DEFENDANTS MOT & APPL TO WITHDRAW FUNDS FROM REGISTRY OF CT Film code Number 787835781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM CONRAD B GUTHRIE Film code Number 786993065

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF ORAL HEARING Film code Number 787835786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM MICHAEL E DENOSKY Film code Number 784904850

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF DEPOSIT PURSUANT TO FINAL JUDG Film code Number 784860838

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORD RECESSING & SCHEDULING RECONVENING OF HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 766873294

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement: SPECIAL COMNR STATEMENT OF SERV Film code Number 766895565

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM FREDRICK D JUNKIN Film code Number 766895571

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM FREDERICK D JUNKIN Film code Number 766873329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Event: OF HEARING Film code Number 766823795

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath: OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 764883229

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS GRANTED Film code Number 763954627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN Film code Number 763916791

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #622061 AMT $172.00 PAID BY ANDREWS & KURTH METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUT VS CAMPA JOSE ETAL FILING FEE FOR CONDEMNATION Film code Number 763916790

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS CTY HOSP DIST is a litigant

Latest cases where PORT OF HO AUTHY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOUSTON COMMUN COL S ETAL is a litigant

Latest cases where T-MOBILE WEST LLC is a litigant