This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/19/2020 at 16:14:42 (UTC).

ME ALPHA III LLC VS MICHAEL LEWIS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 ME ALPHA III LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHAEL LEWIS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6552

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Me Alpha III LLC

C/O Dan Murray 15810 Conners Ace

Spring, TX 77379

Defendant

Michael Lewis

Spring, TX 77373

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DuBois, Austin

Attorney at Barry & Sewart PLLC

4151 Southwest Freeway Suite 680

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement: Anna Sewart

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned: Unserved

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

BAS190153 - WRIT OF POSSESSION.pdf

Writ of Possession to be Issued: WRIT OF POSSESSION

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: BOND $17,000.00 AND PAYOUT

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: BOND $17,000.00 AND PAYOUT

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice: BOND $17,000.00 AND PAYOUT

BAS190153 - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING.pdf

Notice: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING

BAS190153 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE.pdf

Notice of Appearance

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement: Anna Sewart

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 194100423551 RECEIPT #2019-774 $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice: BOND $17,000.00 AND PAYOUT sent to cc's 3-10, reset 5/4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY MICHAEL LEWIS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL AN EVICTION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less