This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 18:56:01 (UTC).

MCGRATH RENTCORP VS THE CALVIN ORGANIZATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 MCGRATH RENTCORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THE CALVIN ORGANIZATION, INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6684

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McGrath Rentcorp

Defendant

The Calvin Organization, Inc.

1255 Highway 6 North, Suite 116

Houston, TX 77084

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DICKSON, KYLE L.

700 Gemini Suite 115

Houston, TX 77058

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal: Murray Lobb PLLC

Exhibit A-Receipt for Bond.pdf

Motion: to Release & Return Bond

Order to Release & Return Bond.pdf

Motion: to Release & Return Bond

Motion to Release & Return Bond.pdf

Motion: to Release & Return Bond

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds

Notice of Nonsuit withOUT Prej.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

Order for Nonsuit withOUT Prej.pdf

Proposed Order

Order for Nonsuit withOUT Prej.pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Writ of Sequestration Returned

Writ of Sequestration Returned: UNSERVED

Return of Service

Return of Service

Writ of Sequestration

Writ of Sequestration Issued: P/UP CABINET #1

Order for Sequestration

Order for Sequestration

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: Cash in Lieu of Sequestration Bond-$1,500.00

Request for Writ of Seq.pdf

Writ of Sequestration Before Judgment to be Issued

Request for Citation.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Petition & App for Writ of Seq.pdf

eFile Original Petition

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal: Murray Lobb PLLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: to Release & Return Bond

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Returned: UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Issued: P/UP CABINET #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration Before Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: Cash in Lieu of Sequestration Bond-$1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less