This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/25/2021 at 14:44:11 (UTC).

M DAVID FROCK VS BLANCA IRIS MORENO HERNANDEZ,JANE AND OR JOHN DOE,UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 M DAVID FROCK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BLANCA IRIS MORENO HERNANDEZ,JANE AND OR JOHN DOE,UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4414

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M David Frock

Defendants

Blanca Iris Moreno Hernandez

Houston, TX 77099

Jane and or John Doe

United Services Automobile Association

C/O Corporation Service Company 211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court

SHERRA V. GILBERT

Houston, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Baron, Neil G

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN III, MICHAEL JOHN

Attorney at GRIFFIN & GRIFFIN

3003 South Loop West, Suite 206

Houston, TX 77054-1372

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Amended Petition and Request for Disclosure(s).pdf

Amended Petition: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

Request for Service (USAA).pdf

Request: Duplicate

Request for Service (USAA).pdf

Amended Citation to be Issued

ROS for Blanca Iris Moreno Hernandez.pdf

Return of Service

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Defendants Original Answer, Demand for Jury Trial and RFD to Plaintiff.pdf

Answer: Jury Demand

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Signed Plaintiff's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Request for Service (Blanca).pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Completed Civil Case Information Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Jury Demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Duplicate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFIN III, MICHAEL JOHN