This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 08:16:25 (UTC).

LURIN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS XV LLC VS CHINA BROOKS,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 LURIN REAL ESTATE HOLDINGS XV LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CHINA BROOKS,ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5924

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lurin Real Estate Holdings XV LLC

C/O Britanie Dwyer, 6300 La Calma Dr Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

China Brooks

Houston, TX 77042

All Other Occupants

Houston, TX 77042

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Daily, Benjamin

Attorney at Lone Star Legal Aid

1415 Fannin Street

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Notice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

Court Reporter Request for Record (Brooks).pdf

Request: For Court Reporters Record

Original Answer Brooks.pdf

Answer

JP Fax Confirmation

JP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

Eviction Letter

Eviction Letter: FILED BY CHINA BROOKS

JP Index

JP Index

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Notice

JP Notice: Of Filing Appeal Bond or Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal a Judgment in a Non-Payment of Rent Eviction

JP Notice

JP Notice: Of Filing Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Citation

JP Citation Returned

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Notice of Trial Setting

JP Citation

JP Citation

JP Military Status Affidavit

JP Military Status Affidavit

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: For Court Reporters Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEviction Letter: FILED BY CHINA BROOKS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Of Filing Appeal Bond or Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal a Judgment in a Non-Payment of Rent Eviction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: Of Filing Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Costs to Appeal an Eviction Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: LKA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lurin Real Estate Holdings XXI LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daily, Benjamin