This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/27/2021 at 16:17:32 (UTC).

LUCAS BELL VS NO NAME SHOWN

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 LUCAS BELL filed an Other lawsuit against NO NAME SHOWN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6292

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lucas Bell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Restrepo, Ruben Dario, Jr.

Attorney at Ruben Restrepo Law, PLLC

2020 Southwest Freeway, Suite 300

Houston, TX 77098

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertified Copy of Occupational Driver's License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: Occupational Hearing set April 5, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: OCCUPATIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Restrepo, Ruben Dario, Jr.