This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/05/2020 at 09:21:00 (UTC).

LUC LE,KIM VO VS MICHAEL C MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 LUC LE,KIM VO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHAEL C MITCHELL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6578

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kim Vo

Houston, TX 77072

Luc Le

Houston, TX 77072

Defendant

Michael C Mitchell

Houston, TX 77084

 

Court Documents

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned: Served

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Property Possession Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

JP Judgment

JP Judgment: #2

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Notice

JP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION

JP Answer

JP Answer: FOR APPEARANCE

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

JP Index

JP Index

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY MICHAEL C. MITCHELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice of Trial Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment: #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment: #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Answer: FOR APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Index

    Read MoreRead Less