This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2017 at 16:08:34 (UTC).

LORENA SERRANO ET AL. VS. VALLERY HOLMES

Case Summary

On 01/21/2016 LORENA SERRANO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VALLERY HOLMES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2684

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LORENA SERRANO

MARILYN SERRANO

Defendant

VALLERY HOLMES

Guardian Ad Litem

JEFFREY R. NEWPORT

Other

STEWART J GUSS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SASSEEN, BRANTLEY M.

12777 Jones Road Ste 297

Houston, TX 77070

NEWPORT, JEFFREY R.

8431 Katy Freeway, Suite 100

Houston, TX 77024

Defendant Attorney

AZIZ, MUSTAFA

Attorney at SUSAN L. FLORENCE & ASSOCIATES

440 Louisiana St, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer: ORIGINAL ANSWER OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM Film code number CCCL-2016-188956

serano judg signed_Marilyn Serano-0357653674.1.PDF

Proposed Order: Agreed Judgment Involving Minor

Notice

Notice: of judgment agreed judgment in favor of plaintiff

Order for Continuance

Order for Continuance

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Order for Continuance

Order for Continuance: granted

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: To be deposited into the registry of the court For the use and benefit of Marilyn Serrano $9,448.72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of judgment agreed judgment in favor of plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAgreed Judgment and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Agreed Judgment Involving Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Continuance: granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing: MINOR SETTLEMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-290371

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: AMENDED NOTICE OF MINOR SETTLEMENT HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCrt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • DocketAttorney Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2016-164238

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: ANSWER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCrt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketAttorney Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Initiation Event (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NEWPORT, JEFFREY R.