Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/16/2021 at 09:59:53 (UTC).

LAPOLLA INDUSTRIES, INC. VS SAMMY VERA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 LAPOLLA INDUSTRIES, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAMMY VERA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8971

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lapolla Industries, Inc.

Defendant

Sammy Vera

Houston, TX 77093

Not Classified By Court

Michael S. Wright

Houston, TX 77057

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gould, Eric

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ERIC GOULD

5773 Woodway Suite 184

Houston, TX 77057

Defendant Attorney

PARZIVAND, HESSAM

Attorney at THE PARZIVAND LAW FIRM, PLLC

10701 Corporate Dr., Ate. 185

Sugar Land, TX 77477

 

Court Documents

Execution Returned

Execution Returned: UNEXECUTED

2021_01_25_18_03_25.pdf

Abstract of Judgment & Writ of Execution to be Issued

Abstract

Abstract Issued

Writ of Execution

Execution Issued

Summary Judgment and Notice

Summary Judgment and Notice

Summary Judgment and Notice

Summary Judgment and Notice

PLAINTIFF'S FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO JUDGE.pdf

Summary Judgment and Notice

CRG - DR foam MSJ to Ct.pdf

Motion for Summary Judgment

CRG - DR Foam N of Subm.pdf

Notice of Submission: on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

CRG - Dr Foam Final Judgment.pdf

Proposed Order: Final Judgment

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Original Answer.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

Return of Service

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Returned: UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment & Writ of Execution to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummary Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission: on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CONSTABLE CABINET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition (sworn Account)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: Letter to Clerk Requesting Issuance of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lapolla Industries, Inc. is a litigant