This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 16:48:02 (UTC).

LAKN, LLC VS JOSE CHAVEZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DOING BUSINESS AS CHAVEZ REMODELING AND ELECTRIC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 LAKN, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE CHAVEZ, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DOING BUSINESS AS CHAVEZ REMODELING AND ELECTRIC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2485

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKN, LLC

Defendant

Jose Chavez, Individually, and Doing Business As Chavez Remodeling and Electric

1234 Blodgett

Houston, TX 77004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Deyon, Derek H

Attorney at The Deyon Law Group, PLLC

440 Louisiana St., Ste. 900

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

plaintiff.original.petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

civil.process.request.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: Civil Process Request

return.of.service.pdf

Return of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: Civil Process Request

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jose Chavez, Individually, and Doing Business As Chavez Remodeling and Electric is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deyon, Derek H