Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/15/2021 at 14:51:46 (UTC).

LADYS SAURY SANCHEZ VS KROGER TEXAS L.P.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 LADYS SAURY SANCHEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against KROGER TEXAS L P. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7147

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ladys Saury Sanchez

Defendant

Kroger Texas L.P.

C/O Corporation Service Company 211 E.7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Not Classified By Court

Diana C. Dale

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACEVEDO, KEVIN

Attorney at GONZALEZ LAW GROUP PLLC

7151 Office City Drive Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77087

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C

Attorney at THE AKERS FIRM, PLLC

3401 Allen Parkway, Suite 101

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

AM-ANS.3PT.pdf

Amended Answer: First

Initial Disclosures.pdf

Notice: Defendant's Initial Disclosures

Original Answer.pdf

Answer

Jury Demand.pdf

Jury Fee: Defendant's Application and Demand for Trial by Jury

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

KROGER TEXAS LP 147.pdf

Return of Service

2021.04.14 Payment to Court for copy fees.pdf

Request: Payment for Service Copies Only

Original Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

Civil Process Request Form (Harris County Court).pdf

eFile Original Petition: Jury Demand and Citation to be issued**OWES COPY FEES**

2021.03.30 P's Original Petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Jury Demand and Citation to be issued**OWES COPY FEES**

2021.04.07 Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition.pdf

Amended Petition: First Amended Petition

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Defendant's Initial Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee: Defendant's Application and Demand for Trial by Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Payment for Service Copies Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Jury Demand and Citation to be issued**OWES COPY FEES**

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ACEVEDO, KEVIN