This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 16:55:06 (UTC).

KELVIN IKNER VS NICOLE CLARK,CIERA SIMPSON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 KELVIN IKNER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against NICOLE CLARK,CIERA SIMPSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6543

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelvin Ikner

Spring, TX 77382

Defendants

Nicole Clark

Houston, TX 77084

Ciera Simpson

Houston, TX 77084

 

Court Documents

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: BOND $21,000.00

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: BOND $21,000.00

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: BOND $21,000.00

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: BOND $21,000.00

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Cases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

Pauper's Eviction

Pauper's Eviction: FILED BY NICOLE CLARK

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Docket Sheet

JP Docket Sheet

JP Judgment

JP Judgment

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Answer

JP Answer

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Receipts

JP Receipts: $2.100.00

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL # 195200434903 RECEIPT # 2019-529 $ 2,100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: BOND $21,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPauper's Eviction: FILED BY NICOLE CLARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Fax Confirmation: REQUEST TO TRANSFER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Military Status Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Receipts: $196.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Docket Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Receipts: $2.100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less