This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 11:00:51 (UTC).

KATHRINE ALLISON,MICHAEL DURU VS TENISHA HARRINGTON

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 KATHRINE ALLISON,MICHAEL DURU filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TENISHA HARRINGTON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2786

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kathrine Allison

Michael Duru

Defendant

Tenisha Harrington

Katy, TX 77494

Not Classified By Court

Michael A Hawash

Houston, TX 77019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Areola, Rotimi Olugboyega

9894 Bissonnet Ste 760

Houston, TX 77036

Defendant Attorney

CAVANAGH, JONATHAN D

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77046

 

Court Documents

Allison - Def's Mtn Compel Discovery (3.13.2023).pdf

Motion to Compel: Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses with Proposed Order- Set for Submission

Allison - Order on Def's Mtn Compel Discovery (3.13.2023).pdf

Motion to Compel: Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses with Proposed Order- Set for Submission

Order on Defendant's Motion to Remove Suit from Expedited Actions Process to Judge.pdf

Order Granted

Allison - Notice of Submisison (1.23.2023).pdf

Notice of Submission

Allison - Order on Defendant's Motion to Remove Suit from Expedited Actions Process (1.23.2023).pdf

Proposed Order

Allison - Def's Mtn Remove Expedited (1.20.2023).pdf

Motion: to Remove Suit From Expedited Actions Process

Allison - Deficiency of Service Letter.pdf

Letter: Deficiency of Service

RIGHT SHOULDER.pdf

Exhibits

DURU, MICHAEL UCHECHUKWU_MRI LSP.pdf

Exhibits

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Allison and Duru v. Harrington - Def's Jury Demand.pdf

Notice: Defendant's Jury Demand

Allison and Duru v. Harrington - Def's Answer.pdf

Answer: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

Return of Service

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

ORIGINAL PETITION.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be Issued

CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be Issued

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel: Plaintiffs' Discovery Responses with Proposed Order- Set for Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: to Remove Suit From Expedited Actions Process

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Deficiency of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: to defendants request for disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Defendant's Jury Demand

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: DEFENDANTS ORIGINAL ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less