Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/07/2021 at 15:18:21 (UTC).

KASH CAPITAL VS EMBA CORP, INC,MERISA KOCAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 KASH CAPITAL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against EMBA CORP, INC,MERISA KOCAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5538

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

KASH CAPITAL

Defendants

MERISA KOCAN

Conyers, GA 30012

EMBA CORP, INC

2420 Kinmor Inc Pkwy Nw

Conyers, GA 30012

Garnishee

CAPITAL ONE, N.A.

C/O Corporation Svc Co 211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

REGENT, ANH H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

Garnishee Attorney

WALTON, DAVID A

Attorney at Bell Nunnally & Martin LLP

2323 Ross Ave., Ste 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Nonsuit Garnishment---Sent to Judge

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - Cap One - Emba(kash).pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - Emba

Proposed Order of Nonsuit Garnishment - Cap One - Emba(kash).pdf

Proposed Order: of Nonsuit Garnishment - Emba

Kocan_Answer to Writ of Garnishment.pdf

Answer: Capital One, N.A.'s Original Answer to Writ of Garnishment

5861527-39709511-SHpmTE6M2cR4Ugm.pdf

Return of Service

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY ANH H. REGENT

EJ - EMBA Corp, Inc.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment

Notice of Filing a Foreign Judgment - Emba Corp.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment

Notice of Filing a Foreign Judgment -service copy- Emba Corp.pdf

Notice: Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment - service

Cover letter for Writ of Garnishment - Capital One.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Writ of Garnishment - Capital One.pdf

Application for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - Emba

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: of Nonsuit Garnishment - Emba

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Capital One, N.A.'s Original Answer to Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY ANH H. REGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketForeign Judgment Closure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment - service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KASH CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALTON, DAVID A