Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 04/14/2021 at 14:56:26 (UTC).

KASH CAPITAL VS DAN D WATSON DBA D WATSON COMPANIES,DAN D WATSON

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 KASH CAPITAL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against DAN D WATSON DBA D WATSON COMPANIES,DAN D WATSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5759

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

KASH CAPITAL

Defendants

DAN D WATSON DBA D WATSON COMPANIES

Salado, TX 76571

DAN D WATSON

Salado, TX 76571

Garnishee

Texas Regional Bank

C/O Mark Ramiarez 2019 Ss 77 Sunshine Strip

Harlington, TX 78550

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

REGENT, ANH H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Nonsuit Garnishment ---Sent to Judge

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice of Nonsuit Garnishment - TX Regional Bank - Dan D Watson.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: Garnishment - Dan D Watson

Proposed Order of Nonsuit Garnishment - TX Regional Bank - Dan D Watson.pdf

Proposed Order: of Nonsuit Garnishment - Dan D Watson

5863462-39700870-vm3CSChD0Pe7dSX.pdf

Return of Service

Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment - service copy - Dan D Watson.pdf

Notice: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment - Service Copy

Cover letter for Writ of Garnishment - Texas Regional bank.pdf

Letter: Cover Letter for Writ of Garnishment

Application for Writ of Garnishment - Texas Regional bank.pdf

Application for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY ANH H. REGENT

EJ - Dan D Watson.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment

Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment - signed - Dan D Watson.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: Garnishment - Dan D Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: of Nonsuit Garnishment - Dan D Watson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Cover Letter for Writ of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY ANH H. REGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment - Service Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketForeign Judgment Closure

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEXAS REGIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where KASH CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H