Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 14:30:55 (UTC).

KASH CAPITAL VS AMERICAN WRAP SHOP, INC.,MIRNA IBETTE FLAMENCO

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 KASH CAPITAL filed an Other lawsuit against AMERICAN WRAP SHOP, INC ,MIRNA IBETTE FLAMENCO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7584

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

KASH CAPITAL

Defendants

MIRNA IBETTE FLAMENCO

Ontario, CA 91761

AMERICAN WRAP SHOP, INC.

3949 Guasti Road

Ontario, CA 91761

Garnishee

BANK OF THE WEST, N.A.

C/O Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

REGENT, ANH H

Attorney at Regent & Associates

500 Lovett Blvd. Ste. 225

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

5900705-40047797-5Men5hwBipeS1ch.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment - service copy - American Wrap Shop.pdf

Notice: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment - Service Copy

Cover letter for Writ of Garnishment - Bank of the West.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Application for Writ of Garnishment - Bank of the West.pdf

Application for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

Exemplified Judgment - American Wrap Shop Inc.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Foreign Judgment

Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment - American Wrap Shop.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Foreign Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment After Judgment (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Notice of Filing of a Foreign Judgment - Service Copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Foreign Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketForeign Judgment Closure

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KASH CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where BANK OF THE WEST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REGENT, ANH H