Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/09/2021 at 12:58:00 (UTC).

JTL ELECTRIC LLC VS NORMAN TALBOTT

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 JTL ELECTRIC LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORMAN TALBOTT. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9541

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JTL ELECTRIC LLC

Defendant

NORMAN TALBOTT

Missouri City, TX 77459

Not Classified By Court

ROBERT CASEY

Spring, TX 77386

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTZ III, CHARLES H

411 Fannin, Ste. 200

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Rubal, Mark A

15150 Middlebrook Drive

Houston,, TX 77058

 

Court Documents

Second Amended Answer.pdf

Amended Answer: Second

Defendant 1 - 28.pdf

Exhibit List

Trial Exhibits.pdf

Exhibit List

03162102.pdf

Exhibit List: No Fee Documents

Original Answer of Talbot GC to JTL.pdf

Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

First Amended Answer.pdf

Amended Answer: First

Certificate of Written Discovery 01.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery: Certificate of Written Discovery 01

11232006.pdf

Amended Petition: first

11232007.pdf

Amended Citation to be Issued

Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Disc Citation Issued: M/O ATTY CHARLES PORTZ

12142001.pdf

Return of Service

JTL ELECTRIC.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer: Second

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List: No Fee Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit List

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery: Certificate of Written Discovery 01

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Disc Citation Issued: M/O ATTY CHARLES PORTZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: first

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: **CAN NOT ISSUE NAME OF DEF DO NOT MATCH **Citation to be issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTZ III, CHARLES H