This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 12/03/2022 at 20:06:14 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. VS MANUEL D CARREON PADILLA

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MANUEL D CARREON PADILLA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1701

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.

Defendant

MANUEL D CARREON PADILLA

Katy, TX 77449-1446

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FORD, JOSHUA A

Attorney at MOSS LAW FIRM, P.C.

P.O. Box 3340

Lubbock, TX 79452

 

Court Documents

AX40A22901233CL.PDF

Citation to Be Issued

AX40A22901233.PDF

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O PCP

AX06A22901233.PDF

Motion for Substituted Service: and Proposed Order

AX07A22901233.PDF

Motion for Substituted Service: and Proposed Order

Order for Rule 106---Sent to Judge

Order for Rule 106

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service: and Proposed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O PCP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua W Ford