This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/12/2020 at 18:13:21 (UTC).

JP OAKWOOD INVESTMENTS VS MARY POWELL

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 JP OAKWOOD INVESTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARY POWELL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6613

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JP Oakwood Investments

C/O Maria Capuchinas 3120 Pasadena Blvd.

Pasadena, TX 77503

Defendant

Mary Powell

Pasadena, TX 77503

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pruyn, Thomas D.

Attorney at PRUYN LAW FIRM, PLLC

2311 Canal Street, Ste 124

Houston, TX 77003

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Writ of Property Possession Returned

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds: Granted

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession to be Issued

Writ of Possession on Property (Court Judgment)

Writ of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

JP Citation Returned

JP Citation Returned

JP Judgment

JP Judgment: DEFAULT

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

JP Request for Appeal

JP Request for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

JP Notice

JP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

JP Receipts

JP Receipts: $121.00

JP Receipts

JP Receipts: $839.00

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

Transcript from Justice of the Peace Court

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Property Possession Issued: CONSTABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketFunds to Registry of Court: DEPOSIT JP APPEAL 198100450838 RECEIPT #2019-115 $839.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCases Appealed from Lower Courts (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Citation Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Judgment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION IN AN EVICTION PROCEEDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Request for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Affidavit of Inability to Pay Costs for Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Notice: OF FILING APPEAL BOND OR STATEMENT OF INABILITY TO AFFORD PAYMENT OF COSTS TO APPEAL A JUDGMENT IN A NON-PAYMENT OF RENT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Receipts: $121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJP Receipts: $839.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTranscript from Justice of the Peace Court

    Read MoreRead Less