Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/12/2021 at 14:46:06 (UTC).

JOSE CURIEL VS OZU HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 JOSE CURIEL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OZU HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3812

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jose Curiel

Defendant

Ozu Holdings, LLC

C/O Ajay Rajeev Karayan 11903 Oakcroft Dr

Houston, TX 77070

Not Classified By Court

MITCHELL KATINE

Houston, TX 77004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grosu, Bogdan Leonard

11767 Katy Fwy Ste 920

Houston, TX 77079

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C

Attorney at THE AKERS FIRM, PLLC

3401 Allen Parkway, Suite 101

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

Notices Returned

Notices Returned

Return of Service

Return of Service

Original Answer-Curiel.pdf

Answer

Jury Demand-Curiel.pdf

Jury Fee: Defendant's Application and Demand for Trial by Jury (Jury Fee Paid)

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Notices Returned

Notices Returned

Letter to Intake Clerk.pdf

Request: Payment for service copy

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

POP- Curiel .pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued (owes copy fees)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee: Defendant's Application and Demand for Trial by Jury (Jury Fee Paid)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest: Payment for service copy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued (owes copy fees)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grosu, Bogdan Leonard