This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 01/19/2022 at 05:15:51 (UTC).

JOE JUAREZ VS WALMART, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 JOE JUAREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALMART, INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6168

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joe Juarez

Defendant

Walmart, Inc.

C/O Registered Agent, Ct Corporation System1999 Bryan St., Ste 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Not Classified By Court

JOSE LOPEZ, II

Houston, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Walls, William M.

2927 Broadway

Houston, TX 77017

Defendant Attorney

Cox, Maryalyce

500 Dallas Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

OP Jose Juarez (Walmart).pdf

eFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED (JURY FEE PAID)

Original Petition CMCC RRR Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: CERTIFIED MAIL TRAY

Return of Service

Return of Service

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Juarez v. Walmart - Defendant's Original Answer.pdf

Answer

Juarez v. Walmart - Notice of Submission to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.pdf

Notice of Submission

Juarez v. Walmart - Proposed Order to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.pdf

Proposed Order

Juarez v. Walmart - Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.pdf

Motion for Summary Judgment

Order to Dismiss (submitted).pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Order on Motion to Dismiss (Juarez-1166168).pdf

Proposed Order

Motion for Non-suit (Juarez-116168).pdf

Motion for Non-Suit

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: CERTIFIED MAIL TRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: & CITATION TO BE ISSUED (JURY FEE PAID)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cox, Maryalyce W