Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 07/29/2021 at 14:57:59 (UTC).

JESSICA MOLINA VS RUBEN GUZMAN,OCTAVIA GUZMAN

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 JESSICA MOLINA filed an Other lawsuit against RUBEN GUZMAN,OCTAVIA GUZMAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4048

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA MOLINA

Defendants

OCTAVIA GUZMAN

Houston, TX 77038-2697

RUBEN GUZMAN

Houston, TX 77038-2697

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Fleurinord, Kia R.

11111 Katy Freeway, Suite 910

Houston, TX 77079

MAYER , ERIC J

1000 Louisiana Suite 5100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

Nguyen, Vy T

Attorney at Nguyen Offices, PLLC

5177 Richmond Ave, Ste. 1200

Houston, TX 77056

 

Court Documents

First Amd Petition.pdf

Amended Petition: First Amended

RUBENGUZMANANDOCTAVIAGUZMAN.Orig. Answer (TO).pdf

Answer

EMayer NOA.pdf

Notice of Appearance

Amended Notice of Appearance - Eric Mayer.pdf

Notice of Appearance: Amended Notice

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

Return of Service

Return of Service

Return of Service

Return of Service

Request for Service_OGuzman_CCL.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Request for Service_RGuzman_CCL.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition_Molina_CCL.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Legal Aid Certificate_Molina_CCL.pdf

Affidavit of Indigency: AFFIDAVIT FOR INABILITY TO AFFORD COSTS

Inability to Afford Payment Affidavit_CCL.pdf

Affidavit of Indigency: AFFIDAVIT FOR INABILITY TO AFFORD COSTS

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: First Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance: Amended Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: HOLD FOR CONSTABLE PICK UP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Indigency: AFFIDAVIT FOR INABILITY TO AFFORD COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYER , ERIC J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fleurinord, Kia R