This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/11/2021 at 14:59:50 (UTC).

JENNIFER LOPEZ VS OZU HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 JENNIFER LOPEZ filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OZU HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4016

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jennifer Lopez

Defendant

Ozu Holdings, LLC

C/O Ajay Rajeev Karayan 11903 Oakcroft Dr.

Houston, TX 77070

Not Classified By Court

Bryan D Coleman

Houston,, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grosu, Bogdan Leonard

11767 Katy Fwy Ste 920A

Houston, TX 77079

Defendant Attorney

AKERS, BROCK C

Attorney at THE AKERS FIRM, PLLC

3401 Allen Parkway, Suite 101

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

AM-ANS - 3PT -Exemp-Punitive.pdf

Amended Answer: First

Initial Disclosures.pdf

Notice: Defendant's Initial Disclosures

Responses to P's First Request for Admissions.pdf

Response: Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff s First Request for Admissions

Return of Service

Return of Service

Original Answer-Lopez.pdf

Answer

Jury Demand - Lopez.pdf

Jury Fee

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

POP- Lopez.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Defendant's Initial Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse: Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff s First Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Answer: First

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Citation to be issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AKERS, BROCK C.