This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 12:00:41 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC VS HELEN OWUSU

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HELEN OWUSU. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6600

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc

Defendant

Helen Owusu

Houston, TX 77056-6218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olsen-Zhang, Jessica

Attorney at Rausch, Sturm, Israel, Enerson & Hornik LLC

15660 N Dallas Parkway #350

Dallas, TX 75248

 

Court Documents

3803460_NOTICE.PDF

Motion for Non-Suit

3803460_ORDER.PDF

Proposed Order

3803460_ORDER.PDF

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Citation Returned: Unserved

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

RSIEH_3803460_pet_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

RSIEH_3803460_let_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation Returned: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Adms Disc Int Prod Citation Issued: M/O TO ABC-DALLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less