Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 22:44:28 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC VS DELFINO RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DELFINO RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7518

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems Llc

Defendant

Delfino Rodriguez

Houston, TX 77009

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUNJAL, ALEX ANSHUL

Attorney at SCOTT & ASSOCIATES PC

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

 

Court Documents

Lead_Motion_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Motion for Substituted Service

Order for Rule 106 (submitted)

Order for Rule 106: Granted

Lead_ProofofServiceorNonService_eABC_filing_package.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: ABC

ScottParnell_1553481_PET_eABC.pdf

eFile Original Petition

ScottParnell_1553481_LET_eABC.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Rule 106: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Substituted Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: ABC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alex Anshul Munjal