This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/21/2017 at 03:36:31 (UTC).

JAMISON BRUCE L ETAL ET AL. VS. GAMEZ JESSE

Case Summary

On 09/19/2000 JAMISON BRUCE L ETAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GAMEZ JESSE. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **1052

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2000

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMISON & ASSOCT*DBA*

JAMISON BRUCE L ETAL

Defendant

GAMEZ JESSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAY, THOMAS R.

16600 Park Row

Houston, TX 77084

Defendant Attorney

GAMEZ III , JESUS MARIA

111 E Commerce

San Antonio, TX 78205

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2001
  • Agreed Judgment: JUDGEMENT GRANTED BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ Film code Number 728713776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2001
  • Notice: NOTICE OF JUDGMENT FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF SIGNED 03122001 JAMISON BRUCE L ETAL VS GAMEZ JESSE Film code Number 728713642

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2001
  • Notice: OF SUBMISSION OF AGD JUDG - BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ Film code Number 728694256

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2001
  • Notice: OF APPEARANCE - BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ Film code Number 728694258

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2001
  • Notice: OF ORAL HEARING - BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ Film code Number 727731974

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2001
  • Motion: PLTF MOT FOR SUMMARY JUDG - BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ Film code Number 727731977

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2001
  • Order: ORDER FOR TRIAL SETTING JAMISON BRUCE L ETAL VS GAMEZ JESSE SET FOR TRIAL ON 04102001 TRIAL TIME 09:00 A.M. Film code Number 726663698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2000
  • Answer: DEFTS ORIG ANS FILED BY JESSE GAMEZ - BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GOMEZ Film code Number 725744170

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2000
  • Citation Returned: BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ IMPROPER SERV Film code Number 725722452

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2000
  • Citation Issued: BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ Film code Number 722773693

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • Cash Receipt: CR #253327 AMT $150.00 PAID BY JAMISON & ASSOC JAMISON BRUCE L ETAL VS GAMEZ JESSE PET.FILED1_ CIT.(S)TO BE ISSUED HOLD FOR PICK UP Film code Number 722764111

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • Contract: ORIGINAL PETITION FILED - BRUCE L JAMISON ETAL VS JESSE GAMEZ Film code Number 722764112

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2000
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jamison & Associates, PLLC is a litigant