Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 13:48:03 (UTC).

JAMES P GRANTHAM VS. EMPOWERMENT OPTIONS ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2014 JAMES P GRANTHAM filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EMPOWERMENT OPTIONS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7818

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRANTHAM JAMES P

Houston, TX 77008

JAMES P GRANTHAM

Houston, TX 77008

Defendants

WALLACE JAY M.

Dallas, TX 75204

JUDICIAL WORKPLACE ARBITRATIONS INC

EMPOWERMENT OPTIONS

Austin, TX 78723

BELL, NUNNALLY & MARTIN, LLP,

3232 Mckinney Ave., Ste. 1400

Dallas, TX 75204

JAY M. WALLACE

Dallas, TX 75204-2429

BELL, NUNNALLY & MARTIN, LLP

3232 Mckinney Ave., Ste. 1400

Dallas, TX 75204

Not Classified By Court

Maureen McPherson Spector

Houston, TX 77057

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GRANTHAM JAMES P

Attorney at TRIMBLE & GRANTHAM PC

902 Heights Blvd.

Houston, TX 77008

GRANTHAM JAMES PIEPER

Attorney at TRIMBLE & GRANTHAM PC

902 Heights Blvd.

Houston, TX 77008

GRANTHAM, JAMES PIEPER

Attorney at TRIMBLE & GRANTHAM PC

902 Heights Blvd.

Houston, TX 77008

Defendant Attorney

Bohreer, E Michelle

Two Greenway Plaza, #600

Houston, TX 77046

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Alias Citation to be Issued

Alias Citation to be Issued

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 10-20-14 APPEARANCE DATE 11-10-14 Film code number CCCL-2014-360499

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Answer

Answer: DEFENDANT EMPOWERMENT OPTIONS, INC Film code number CCCL-2014-381300

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Notice of Order

Notice of Order: NON-SUITED / DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-407089

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Order: NON-SUITED / DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-407089

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer: DEFENDANT EMPOWERMENT OPTIONS, INC Film code number CCCL-2014-381300

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: ORIGINAL ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Alias Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOHREER, E. MICHELLE