Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 17:19:46 (UTC).

IRS MEDIATORS CORP VS. FRANKIE FLORES

Case Summary

On 06/27/2014 IRS MEDIATORS CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANKIE FLORES. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-002

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES FRANKIE

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendants

NGUYEN SIEU

NGUYEN DINH Q

ADAM ALTAF

Counter Defendants

IRS MEDIATORS CORP

ALTAF ADAM

DINH Q NGUYEN

SIEU NGUYEN

Counter Plaintiff

FRANKIE FLORES

Emeryville, CA 94608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITLEY ROBERT ALLEN

Attorney at BLASINGAME WHITLEY

12621 Featherwood Drive, Ste. 282

Houston, TX 77034

Counter Defendant Attorneys

MILLEDGE, SAMUEL L.

2500 East T.C. Jester Blvd., Suite 510

Houston, TX 77008

Russell, Allen D

Attorney at TAYLOR, TAYLOR & RUSSELL

2777 Allen Parkway, Suite 1000

Houston, TX 77019-2141

SMITH, WENDLE VAN

7322 Southwest Freeway, Suite 2010

Houston, TX 77074

Counter Plaintiff Attorney

Whitley, Robert A

12621 Featherwood Dr Ste 282

Houston, TX 77034

 

Court Documents

First Amended Citation Returned

First Amended Citation Returned: SERVED ON 7-5-14 APPEARANCE DATE 7-28-14 Film code number CCCL-2014-220390

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-151889

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-151889

Original Petition (SUB)

Original Petition (SUB)

Answer

Answer: COUNTER-DEFENDANT ALTAF ADAM'S ORIGINAL ANSWER Film code number CCCL-2014-245389

Certificate

Certificate

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Partial Non-Suited and Notice

Order to Compel

Order to Compel: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL Film code number CCCL-2015-114666

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-151889

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-151889

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-151889

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: NOTICES THAT WHERE MAILED OUT TO PARTIES Film code number CCCL-2016-151970

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-151889

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 4-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Compel: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL Film code number CCCL-2015-114666

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Compel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • First Amended Petition Citation Issued: COUNTERCLAIM CITATION Film code number CCCL-2014-212881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: DEFENDANTS FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cover Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • E-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Citation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Counter Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition (SUB)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Whitley, Robert A