This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 05/18/2023 at 19:00:25 (UTC).

IPFS CORPORATION VS EAGLESLANDING ENTERPRISE LLC

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 IPFS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EAGLESLANDING ENTERPRISE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9905

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IPFS Corporation

Defendant

Eagleslanding Enterprise LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Price, Stephen E.

 

Court Documents

Transmittal Eagleslanding.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Petition Eagleslanding.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

Transmittal.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

First Amended Original Petition.pdf

Amended Petition

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less