This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/01/2023 at 20:04:34 (UTC).

IPFS CORPORATION VS EAGLESLANDING ENTERPRISE LLC

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 IPFS CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EAGLESLANDING ENTERPRISE LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is MANPREET SINGH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9905

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

MANPREET SINGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IPFS Corporation

Defendant

Eagleslanding Enterprise LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Price, Stephen E.

 

Court Documents

Transmittal Eagleslanding.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

Petition Eagleslanding.pdf

eFile Original Petition

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

Transmittal.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

First Amended Original Petition.pdf

Amended Petition

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

executed citation 1199905.pdf

Return of Service

Whitney Certificate 1199905.pdf

Secretary of State Return

1199905 Motion for Default.pdf

Motion for Default Judgment

1199905 Final Default Judgment.pdf

Proposed Order: Final Default Judgment

Default Judgment to Judge.pdf

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

Default Judgment and Notice

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment and Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Final Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSecretary of State Return

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: M/O TRUE GRIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less