This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/11/2022 at 16:24:24 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC VS SHARON WEAVER

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SHARON WEAVER. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-802

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

381 Casa Linda Plaza Pmb #296

Dallas, TX 75218

Defendant

SHARON WEAVER

Tomball, TX 77377

Garnishee

Houston Police Credit Union

C/O President/Vice President, 1600 Memorial Dr

Houston, TX 77007

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

TUCKER, CARL L

Attorney at Law Office of Carl Tucker PLLC

2028 E Ben White Blvd #240-1650

Austin, TX 78741

 

Court Documents

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY CARL TUCKER

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

WEAVER-NTC.pdf

Notice: of Garnishment

WEAVER-AFF.pdf

Affidavit: of Garnishment

WEAVER-RS.pdf

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned: Served

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Garnishment Dismissal Order

WEAVER-ORD.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

WEAVER-NTC.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY CARL TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Houston Police Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER, CARL L