This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 08/07/2022 at 18:25:27 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC. VS FRANCISCA NUNEZ DE VARELA,FRANCISCA NUNEZ DEVARELA

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRANCISCA NUNEZ DE VARELA,FRANCISCA NUNEZ DEVARELA. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******-803

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS, INC.

2028 E Ben White Blvd #240-1650

Austin, TX 78741

Defendants

FRANCISCA NUNEZ DEVARELA

San Antonio, TX 78213

FRANCISCA NUNEZ DE VARELA

Houston, TX 77011

Garnishor

Investment Retrievers Inc

Garnishee

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Garnishor Attorney

TUCKER, CARL L

Attorney at Law Office of Carl Tucker PLLC

2028 E Ben White Blvd #240-1650

Austin, TX 78741

 

Court Documents

VARELA-WL-NTC 2.pdf

Notice: of Garnishment

VARELA-WL-NTC 1.pdf

Notice: of Garnishment

VARELA-WL-AFF.pdf

Affidavit: For Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Application for Garnishment No-Fee

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY CARL TUCKER

VARELA-ord.pdf

Proposed Order

VARELA-ntc.pdf

Motion for Non-Suit: garnishee

Nonsuit--sent to judge

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Notice Garnishment Non-Suit

Garnishment Dismissal Order

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned

Writ of Garnishment After Judgment Returned: Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Returned: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGarnishment Dismissal Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit: garnishee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment After Judgment Issued: M/O ATTY CARL TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Garnishment No-Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit: For Writ of Garnishment After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Garnishment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Investment Retrievers, Inc., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TUCKER, CARL L