This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 06/10/2020 at 15:16:25 (UTC).

INGRID BONILLA,BRIZZIA BONILLA VS DELMIS MARICELA LOPEZ PINTO

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 INGRID BONILLA,BRIZZIA BONILLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DELMIS MARICELA LOPEZ PINTO. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE BARNSTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6575

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE BARNSTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRIZZIA BONILLA

INGRID BONILLA

Defendant

DELMIS MARICELA LOPEZ PINTO

Houston, TX 77036

Not Classified By Court

ROBERT CASEY

Spring, TX 77386

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BURLESON, ASHLEY

955 Dairy Ashford St, Suite 110

Houston, TX 77079

Defendant Attorney

HARRISON, JACQUELINE MURRY

11811 North Frwy, Ste 700

Houston, TX 77060

 

Court Documents

Late Discovery Letter.pdf

Letter: LATE DISCOVERY

Def's Original Answer.pdf

Answer: and Jury Demand

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

RETURN SERVICE.pdf

Return of Service

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET #1

REQUEST FOR SERVICE.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

ORIGINAL PETITION.pdf

eFile Original Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: LATE DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: and Jury Demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: P/UP CABINET #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less