Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/14/2017 at 05:18:07 (UTC).

IFCO SYSTEMS NA INC VS. UNITED NATURAL FOODS

Case Summary

On 05/02/2013 IFCO SYSTEMS NA INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against UNITED NATURAL FOODS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1247

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IFCO SYSTEMS NA INC

Defendant

UNITED NATURAL FOODS

301 Promenade St

Providence, RI 02908

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KNIGHT ANN E

KNIGHT, ANN E

Attorney at J DIAMOND AND ASSOC PLLC

730 North Loop

Houston, TX 77009

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 5-16-13 APPEARANCE DATE 6-10-13 Film code number CCCL-2013-187072

Certificate Returned

Certificate Returned: APPEARANCE DATE 06-10-13 Film code number CCCL-2013-198102

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate Returned: APPEARANCE DATE 06-10-13 Film code number CCCL-2013-198102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Returned: SERVED ON 5-16-13 APPEARANCE DATE 6-10-13 Film code number CCCL-2013-187072

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Natural Foods, Inc. is a litigant