Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/16/2017 at 07:51:24 (UTC).

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. WONDERLAND PARK LLC ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2014 HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WONDERLAND PARK LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6460

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants

WONDERLAND PARK LLC

1001 Fannin Street #2500

Houston, TX 77002

TAXING AUHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HISD

Houston, TX 77092

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDISON ANDREW M

Attorney at EDISON MCDOWELL & HETHERINGTON

3200 Southwest Frwy #2100

Houston, TX 77027

Edison, Andrew M

1001 Fannin Street Ste 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorney

MURPHY III, GEORGE R

Attorney at VINSON & ELKINS LLP

1001 Fannin Street Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS-LAURA CAMARILLO Film code number CCCL-2015-40269

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONER-GEORGE MURPHY Film code number CCCL-2015-40366

Tax Claim

Tax Claim

Order to Withdraw Funds

Order to Withdraw Funds: -901 GRANTED Film code number CCCL-2015-65305

Motion to Withdraw Funds

Motion to Withdraw Funds

Letter

Letter: TAXING AUTHORITIES' DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST ON TOTAL TAKING OF TAX ACCOUNT Film code number CCCL-2015-63510

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-66122

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Agreed Judgment and Notice

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-95937

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Award

Award: AWARD FILED ON JANUARY 14, 2015 IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,041,740.00 SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS FEES SET AT $450 EACH JUDGE SIGNED JANUARY 28, 2015 Film code number CCCL-2015-34328

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) $1,041,740.00 Film code number CCCL-2015-19715

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF POSSESSION SET FOR 1-27-15 Film code number CCCL-2015-21774

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS FAXED TO MELISSA SPINKS Film code number CCCL-2015-25424

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEPOSIT SET FOR 2-3-15 Film code number CCCL-2015-25810

Exhibit

Exhibit: -901 PAYOUT HISTORY Film code number CCCL-2015-41348

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEPOSIT SET FOR 2-19-15 Film code number CCCL-2015-59961

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-90368

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Withdrawal: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-95937

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Agreed Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-90368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Reactivate Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Withdrawal: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-72718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 1-Motion for Entry/Notice of Intent to Dismiss-Settle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-66122

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) $1,041,740.00 Film code number CCCL-2015-19715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Award: AWARD FILED ON JANUARY 14, 2015 IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,041,740.00 SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS FEES SET AT $450 EACH JUDGE SIGNED JANUARY 28, 2015 Film code number CCCL-2015-34328

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-423359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Port of Houston Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant