Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2017 at 01:04:14 (UTC).

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. UNKNOWN OWNERS OF APSARA HOMES LLP ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/20/2015 HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against UNKNOWN OWNERS OF APSARA HOMES LLP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is CLYDE LEUCHTAG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5080

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

CLYDE LEUCHTAG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

UNKNOWN OWNERS OF APSARA HOMES LLP

Houston, TX 77056

TEA AMARA

Houston, TX 77072

TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77002

CHOW CHARLES K

Houston, TX 77056

AMARA TEA

Houston, TX 77072

CHARLES K CHOW

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDISON ANDREW M

Attorney at EDISON MCDOWELL & HETHERINGTON

3200 Southwest Frwy #2100

Houston, TX 77027

Edison, Andrew M

1001 Fannin Street Ste 2700

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

WILCOX, BRYAN R.

1100 Nasa Parkway, Suite 110

Houston, TX 77058

DORSA JR, JOHN S

550 Post Oak Blvd #570

Houston, TX 77027

 

Court Documents

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT FOR AWARD ($239,400.00) Film code number CCCL-2015-411752

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: TAXING AUTHORITIES MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS - DECEMBER 15, 2015 Film code number CCCL-2015-417730

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS - LAURA CAMARILLO Film code number CCCL-2015-431294

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS- VICTORIA VONDER HAAR Film code number CCCL-2015-431434

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 Film code number CCCL-2016-3896

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT - JANUARY 27, 2016 Film code number CCCL-2016-26095

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2016-31893

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2016-44302

Order to Withdraw Counsel

Order to Withdraw Counsel

Order

Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMIISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2015-255987

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Answer

Answer

Notice

Notice: LIST OF PARTIES TO BE NOTIFIED Film code number CCCL-2015-410428

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS- VICTORIA VONDER HAAR UNABLE TO FORWARD Film code number CCCL-2015-431440

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2016-31893

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial: SIGNED IN COURT Film code number CCCL-2016-31893

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2016-44341

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2016-44351

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Withdraw Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Withdraw Counsel: And Motion To Substitute Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2016-44351

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2016-44341

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2016-44302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2016-44297

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-44231

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-44228

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-44226

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2016-44222

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Not Entered: MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM Film code number CCCL-2015-275724

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM - AUGUST 19, 2015 Film code number CCCL-2015-275444

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION AND ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM, AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMIISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2015-255987

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS, OATH OF COMMISSIONERS, ORDER SETTING TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING, CITATION BY PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Port of Houston Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant