Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 16:35:09 (UTC).

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. MAE MCMILLAN ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2014 HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MAE MCMILLAN. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9074

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

MCMILLAN MAE

Houston, TX 77022

MCMILLAN EFFIE

Houston, TX 77091

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77002

ANDOH VIVIA

Houston, TX 77021

MAE MCMILLAN

Houston, TX 77022

EFFIE MCMILLAN

Houston, TX 77091

VIVIA ANDOH

Houston, TX 77021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDISON ANDREW M

Attorney at EDISON MCDOWELL & HETHERINGTON

3200 Southwest Frwy #2100

Houston, TX 77027

Edison, Andrew M

1001 Fannin Street Ste 2700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Order

Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-224053

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Motion

Motion: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM Film code number CCCL-2014-276154

Order

Order: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM ED WALLISON #20792700 Film code number CCCL-2014-272845

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Notice

Notice: NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213218

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2015-228370

Notice of Judgment

Notice of Judgment: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-244051

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Judgment: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF RETURNED UNDELIVERED Film code number CCCL-2015-244051

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: UNCLAIMED FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF Film code number CCCL-2015-228370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213218

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-200453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SET JUNE 23, 2015 Film code number CCCL-2015-199639

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT, NOTICE OF HEARING, FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Check Disbursement: -901 GRANTED Film code number CCCL-2015-176402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Withdrawal: -901 Film code number CCCL-2015-155190

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM ED WALLISON #20792700 Film code number CCCL-2014-272845

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM Film code number CCCL-2014-276154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: MOTION & ORDER TO APPOINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-224053

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Port of Houston Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant