Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/15/2017 at 06:36:04 (UTC).

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. EL DIABLO HOLDING CO INC ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2014 HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against EL DIABLO HOLDING CO INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4122

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

HOUSTON INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

THE CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77002

TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

RIEDEL W A

Houston, TX 77057

PORT OF HOUSTON AUTHORITY

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HOUSTON COMMUNITY COLLEGE

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY FLOOD CONTROL DISTRICT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT

1300 Main Street

Houston, TX 77002

EL DIABLO HOLDING CO INC

1211 1/2 East 27Th Street

Houston, TX 77009

CITY OF HOUSTON

Houston, TX 77002

ADRIAN CROSS

THE UNKNOWN SHAREHOLDERS OF EL DIABLO HOLDING CO., INC.

W A RIEDEL

Houston, TX 77057

M.A. ARMSTEAD

SHEILIA JARQUETTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

EDISON ANDREW M

Attorney at EDISON MCDOWELL & HETHERINGTON

3200 Southwest Frwy #2100

Houston, TX 77027

Edison, Andrew M

1001 Fannin Street Ste 2700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Order

Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-71721

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Amended Petition

Amended Petition: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITON IN CONDEMNATION Film code number CCCL-2014-117221

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213060

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213068

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213071

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213073

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213074

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213083

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213087

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-218036

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-218036

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213087

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213083

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213074

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213073

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213071

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213068

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notices Returned: FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-213060

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Petition: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITON IN CONDEMNATION Film code number CCCL-2014-117221

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED PETITION FOR CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-71721

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Attorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TAXING AUTHORITIES OF HARRIS COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY EDUCATION DEPARTMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Port of Houston Authority is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County Hospital District is a litigant