This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/16/2022 at 21:05:07 (UTC).

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC VS ADVANCED DALLAS HOSPITAL & CLINICS, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADVANCED DALLAS HOSPITAL CLINICS, LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3430

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Honeywell International, Inc

Defendant

Advanced Dallas Hospital & Clinics, LLC

1911 Bagby St., 2Nd Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Not Classified By Court

Michael A Hawash

Houston, TX 77019

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOTZ, ANDREW B.

Attorney at Totz Ellison Totz

2211 Norfolk, Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

Totz, Jon D.

2211 Norfolk, Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant Attorney

WYNNE, ROBERT PITARD

3701 Kirby Drive, Suite 760

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

105183-Plaintiff's CWD-RFD Responses.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery

105183 clerk Letter-rfd responses.pdf

Letter

105183-Plaintiff's First Supplemental Petition[2] 7-20-22FS.pdf

Supplemental: Plaintiff's First Supplemental Petition

105183 Letter to Court.pdf

Citation to Be Issued: See Letter

First Amended Petition Citation

First Amended Petition Citation Issued: P/U LOOP LEGAL

Plaintiff's Certificate of Written Discovery

Certificate of Written Discovery

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

105183 Service return.pdf

Return of Service

2022-06-27 AD.Honeywell - AD Orig Answer and Verified Denial.pdf

Answer: Defendant's Original Answer

105183 Designation of Attorney in Charge for Plaintiff.pdf

Designation of Attorney

105183 Plaintiff's Designation of Expert Witnesses.pdf

Designation of Expert Witnesses

105183 Letter.pdf

Letter: Letter from Andrew B. Totz

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/U LOOP LEGAL

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: P/U LOOP LEGAL

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Petition Citation Issued: P/U LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental: Plaintiff's First Supplemental Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued: See Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Expert Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Letter from Andrew B. Totz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant's Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: P/U LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Advanced Dallas Hospital & Clinics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WYNNE, ROBERT PITARD