This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/11/2021 at 00:15:43 (UTC).

HOERBIGER SERVICE INC VS. PROLER STEEL INTERNATIONAL LLC ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/03/2014 HOERBIGER SERVICE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROLER STEEL INTERNATIONAL LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are THERESA CHANG and JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3761

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

THERESA CHANG

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOERBIGER SERVICE INC

Defendants

PROLER STEEL INTERNATIONAL LLC

NEWPORT METAL RECYCLING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONAHO THOMAS A

811 Main St #1100

Houston, TX 77002

DONAHO, THOMAS A

811 Main St #1100

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

ZIMMERMAN, BRIAN W.

Attorney at ZIMMERMAN AXELRAD STERN &WISE, PC

3040 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 1300

Houston, TX 77056

MCSTAY, ANDREW

Attorney at PORTO TRUEHEART & MCSTAY LLC

1021 Main St., Suite 1150

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Interlocutory Judgment and Notice

Interlocutory Judgment and Notice: AGREED JUDGMENT AS TO PROLER STEEL INTERNATIONAL LLC ONLY Film code number CCCL-2015-388732

Writ of Execution to be Issued

Writ of Execution to be Issued

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

Citation Returned

Citation Returned: SERVED ON 10-22-14 APPEARANCE DATE 11-17-14 Film code number CCCL-2014-365585

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Designation

Designation: PLAINTIFFS DESIGNATION FROM THE ORAL DEPOSITION OF CHRISTOPHER BRYAN PROLER TAKEN ON 7-01-15 Film code number CCCL-2015-238640

Execution Returned

Execution Returned: UNEXECUTED Film code number CCCL-2016-193998

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Returned: UNEXECUTED Film code number CCCL-2016-193998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExecution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment from Party: (2) Film code number CCCL-2016-42479

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrected Judgment and Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee: MOTION AND ORDER FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
202 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketE-Filing Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketAttorney Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketRECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketRECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • DocketElectronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hoerbiger Service Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMMERMAN, BRIAN WEIL