This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 11/18/2021 at 15:40:31 (UTC).

HERC RENTALS, INC. VS JEGON INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, L.L.C.,REYNA RIOS

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 HERC RENTALS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEGON INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, L L C ,REYNA RIOS. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is JIM KOVACH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4311

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

JIM KOVACH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERC RENTALS, INC.

Defendants

REYNA RIOS

South Houston, TX 77587

JEGON INDUSTRIAL SERVICES, L.L.C.

C/O John B. Loyd. Registered Agent 526 Kentucky St

South Houston, TX 77587

Counter Defendant

Herc Rentals Inc

Counter Plaintiff

Jegon Industrial Services LLC

Not Classified By Court

DENISE E HEWITT PETERSON

Houston, TX 77003

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TOTZ, JON D

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk, Suite #510

Houston, TX 77098

ELLISON, MARC L

Attorney at TOTZ ELLISON & TOTZ PC

2211 Norfolk Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

Ellison, Marc L.

Attorney at Totz, Ellison & Totz, PC

2211 Norfolk, Suite 510

Houston, TX 77098

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

Davin, James M

1220 Blalock Road, Suite 160

Houston, TX 77055

 

Court Documents

103100-mutual dismissal_motion.pdf

Motion to Dismiss

103100-mutual dismissal_order.pdf

Proposed Order

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

NOTICE- DISMISSAL/NONSUIT

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Mutual Dismissal Order (submitted).pdf

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

certificate of discovery

Certificate of Written Discovery

certificate of discovery

Certificate of Written Discovery

103100-certificate.pdf

Certificate of Written Discovery

Jegon Amended Answer and Counterclaim

Counter Claim: & Jegon Amended Answer

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Order of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

Original Petition Citation

Original Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

103100 Plaintiff's Original petition.pdf

eFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

103100 Case Info Sheet.pdf

Civil Case Information Sheet

103100 Clerk letter.pdf

Citation to Be Issued

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCounter Claim: & Jegon Amended Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter: Letter from Marc L. Ellison

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Expert Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer: Defendant Reyna Rios' Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Referral of Mediation-Non DRC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Petition Citation Issued: LOOP LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCitation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERC RENTALS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Davin, James M