Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/09/2017 at 19:23:32 (UTC).

HARRIS CTY TX VS. HOLZWORTH LARRY ETAL ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2010 HARRIS CTY TX filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOLZWORTH LARRY ETAL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERTA LLOYD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **6221

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERTA LLOYD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS CTY TX

Defendants

HUGHES GAIL DOERRE ETAL

Spring, TX 77379

DOERRE PATRICIA ETAL

Spring, TX 77389

HOLZWORTH LARRY ETAL

Spring, TX 77388

HARMEIER GERALDINE ETAL

DOERRE HERBY ETAL

Spring, TX 77379

DOERRE HILDA ETAL

HARMEIER DALE ETAL

HOLZWORTH SUSAN ETAL

Spring, TX 77388

HUGHES HEATHER R ETAL

Spring, TX 77351

DOERRE CYNTHIA ETAL

Spring, TX 77379

DOERRE REX ETAL

Spring, TX 77389

DOERRE GARY L ETAL

Houston, TX 77062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NACHTIGALL, GEORGE A

2712 Centenary Street

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

Original Petition (Filing Fee)

Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN IN CONDEMNATION HARRIS CTY TX VS GARY L DOERRE ETAL Film code Number 783860703

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #686646 NO FEE PAID BY HARRIS COUNTY ATTY HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS VS DOERRE GARY L ET AL FILING ORIGINAL CONDEMNATION NO FEE DUE SEE ATTORNEY GENERAL OPINION M142 Film code Number 783860702

Order

Order: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISIONERS SAVVAS STEFANIDES, GEORGE POLYDOROS AND DAN PARSONS GRANTED Film code Number 784971900

Oath

Oath: OF COMNR Film code Number 784971965

Return of Service

Return of Service: OF NOTC TO HERBY DOERRE ON 9-9-10 Film code Number 785005570

Return of Service

Return of Service: OF NOTICE Film code Number 785005566

Return of Service

Return of Service: OF NOTC TO SUSAN HOLZWORTH ON 9-9-10 Film code Number 785005568

Return of Service

Return of Service: OF NOTC TO DALE HARMEIER ON 9-9-10 Film code Number 785005572

Return of Service

Return of Service: OF NOTC TO HEATHER R HUGHES ON 8-26-10 Film code Number 785005567

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993780

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993781

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993782

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993783

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993784

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993776

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993777

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993778

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993779

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993779

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993778

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993777

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993784

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993783

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993782

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993780

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993775

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service: OF NOTC TO HEATHER R HUGHES ON 8-26-10 Film code Number 785005567

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service: OF NOTC TO DALE HARMEIER ON 9-9-10 Film code Number 785005572

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service: OF NOTC TO SUSAN HOLZWORTH ON 9-9-10 Film code Number 785005568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service: OF NOTICE Film code Number 785005566

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Return of Service: OF NOTC TO HERBY DOERRE ON 9-9-10 Film code Number 785005570

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath: OF COMNR Film code Number 784971965

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISIONERS SAVVAS STEFANIDES, GEORGE POLYDOROS AND DAN PARSONS GRANTED Film code Number 784971900

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #686646 NO FEE PAID BY HARRIS COUNTY ATTY HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS VS DOERRE GARY L ET AL FILING ORIGINAL CONDEMNATION NO FEE DUE SEE ATTORNEY GENERAL OPINION M142 Film code Number 783860702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN IN CONDEMNATION HARRIS CTY TX VS GARY L DOERRE ETAL Film code Number 783860703

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less