Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/09/2017 at 19:23:38 (UTC).

HARRIS CTY TX ET AL. VS. HOLZWORTH SUSAN ETAL ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2010 HARRIS CTY TX filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against HOLZWORTH SUSAN ETAL. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **6220

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS CTY TX

Defendants

KLEIN INDEP SCH DIST ETAL

HARMEIER DALE ETAL

DOERRE PATRICIA ETAL

Spring, TX 77389

HARRIS CTY TX ETAL

Houston, TX 77002

HOLZWORTH SUSAN ETAL

Spring, TX 77388

HARMEIER GERALDINE ETAL

DOERRE HERBY ETAL

HUGHES HEATHER R ETAL

Spring, TX 77379

HOLZWORTH LARRY ETAL

Spring, TX 77388

HUGHES GAIL DOERRE ETAL

Spring, TX 77379

DOERRE HILDA ETAL

DOERRE CYNTHIA ETAL

DOERRE REX ETAL

Spring, TX 77389

DOERRE GARY L ETAL

Houston, TX 77062

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NACHTIGALL, GEORGE A

2712 Centenary Street

Houston, TX 77005

 

Court Documents

Original Petition (Filing Fee)

Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN IN CONDEMNATION HARRIS CTY TX VS GARY L DOERRE ETAL Film code Number 783860695

Cash Receipt

Cash Receipt: CR #686645 NO FEE PAID BY HARRIS COUNTY ATTY OFF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS VS DOERRE GARY L ET AL FILING ORIGINAL CONDEMNATION NO FEE DUE SEE ATTORNEY GENERAL OPINION M142 Film code Number 783860694

Order

Order: OF TRANSFER GRANTED Film code Number 783902283

Order

Order: FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS GRANTED Film code Number 783904224

Oath

Oath: OF COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 783924196

Letter

Letter: FROM GEORGE A NACHTIGALL Film code Number 784826527

Amendment to Original Petition

Amendment to Original Petition: PLAINTIFF FIRST AMENDED PETITION REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN HARRIS CTY TX VS GARY L DOERRE ETAL Film code Number 784826496

Letter

Letter: FROM GEORGE A NACHTIGALL Film code Number 784874333

Amendment to Original Petition

Amendment to Original Petition: PLAINTIFF SECOND AMENDED PETITION REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN PET IN CONDEMNATION Film code Number 784874334

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993792

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993793

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993794

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993795

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993796

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993797

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993798

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993799

Affidavit

Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993800

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993800

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993799

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993798

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993797

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993796

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993795

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993794

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993793

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993792

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit: OF CHECK DISBURSEMENT Film code Number 794993791

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Original Petition: PLAINTIFF SECOND AMENDED PETITION REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN PET IN CONDEMNATION Film code Number 784874334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM GEORGE A NACHTIGALL Film code Number 784874333

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment to Original Petition: PLAINTIFF FIRST AMENDED PETITION REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN HARRIS CTY TX VS GARY L DOERRE ETAL Film code Number 784826496

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter: FROM GEORGE A NACHTIGALL Film code Number 784826527

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath: OF COMMISSIONERS Film code Number 783924196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS GRANTED Film code Number 783904224

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: OF TRANSFER GRANTED Film code Number 783902283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Cash Receipt: CR #686645 NO FEE PAID BY HARRIS COUNTY ATTY OFF HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS VS DOERRE GARY L ET AL FILING ORIGINAL CONDEMNATION NO FEE DUE SEE ATTORNEY GENERAL OPINION M142 Film code Number 783860694

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Petition (Filing Fee): PLTF ORIGINAL PETITION FILED REAL PROPERTY EMINENT DOMAIN IN CONDEMNATION HARRIS CTY TX VS GARY L DOERRE ETAL Film code Number 783860695

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less