This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/16/2017 at 07:08:29 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS VS. WILLARD L JACKSON

Case Summary

On 12/05/2014 HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS filed an Other lawsuit against WILLARD L JACKSON. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6078

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

THERESA CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

Defendants

JACKSON WILLARD L

The Woodlands, TX 77382

WILLARD L JACKSON

The Woodlands, TX 77382

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LONGO DEANNA LYN

Attorney at LINEBARGER, GOGGAN, BLAIR & SAMPSON, L.L.P.

4828 Loop Central Drive, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77081

Longo, Deanna L

4828 Loop Central Drive, Suite 500

Houston, TX 77081

 

Court Documents

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

Citation Issued

Citation Issued

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Citation to Be Issued

Citation to Be Issued

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance

Crt 2-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Crt 2-Order for Trial Resetting-Non Jury

Alias Citation to be Issued

Alias Citation to be Issued

Motion for Continuance

Motion for Continuance: SECOND Film code number CCCL-2015-310898

Order Not Entered

Order Not Entered: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE Film code number CCCL-2015-310899

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

Citation to Be Issued

Citation to Be Issued

Alias Citation to be Issued

Alias Citation to be Issued

Pluries Citation Returned

Pluries Citation Returned: UNSERVED Film code number CCCL-2015-326718

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: NOTICE OF NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE & ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Pluries Citation Returned: UNSERVED Film code number CCCL-2015-326718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Alias Citation to be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 2-Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: REQUEST LETTER, PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation to Be Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 2-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • Conversion Service Event: Executed: N;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Citation Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County, Texas is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Longo, Deanna L