This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/17/2017 at 09:46:18 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS VS. CET LIMITED

Case Summary

On 11/04/2015 HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CET LIMITED. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courthouse located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9748

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY TEXAS

Defendant

CET LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STRICKLIN DONALD ALLEN

Attorney at HARRIS COUNTY, ASSISTANT COUNTY ATTORNEY

1019 Congress, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

STRICKLIN, DONALD ALLEN

Attorney at HARRIS COUNTY, ASSISTANT COUNTY ATTORNEY

1019 Congress, 15Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

Order Setting Fees

Order Setting Fees: SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS FEES SET IN THE AMOUNT OF $225.00 EACH Film code number CCCL-2016-5931

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Order

Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2015-386377

Civil Case Information Sheet

Civil Case Information Sheet

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

Case Initiation Event (OCA)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Setting Fees: SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS FEES SET IN THE AMOUNT OF $225.00 EACH Film code number CCCL-2016-5931

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: NOTICE OF NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE & ORDER SETTING FEES OF THE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS, SPECIAL COMMISSIONER'S STATEMENT OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-NonJury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2015-386377

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Information Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CET LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Harris County, Texas is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRICKLIN, DONALD ALLEN