Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 03/16/2017 at 03:01:29 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY MUNCIPAL UTLITY DISTRICT NO 276 VS. P2H2 INVESTMENTS LLC ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/13/2014 HARRIS COUNTY MUNCIPAL UTLITY DISTRICT NO 276 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against P2H2 INVESTMENTS LLC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LINDA STOREY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4051

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LINDA STOREY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY MUNCIPAL UTLITY DISTRICT NO 276

Defendants

PHARMACON LTD

C/O Lee D Schlanger 109 N Post Oak Lane #300

Houston, TX 77024

P2H2 INVESTMENTS LLC

8614 Crossriver Lane

Houston, TX 77095

NASIR RAJA NADIM

Houston, TX 77057

NAIR INVESTMENTS I LTD

C/O Raja Nasir 1011 Augusta Dr #203

Houston, TX 77057

LISTER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

C/O Lee D Schlanger 109 N Post Oak Lane #300

Houston, TX 77024

INTOWN SUITES KIETH HARROW LP

C/O Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan St #900

Dallas, TX 75201

INDEPENDENCE BANK NA

C/O Okan I Akin Trustee 13100 Northwest Fwy #100

Houston, TX 77040

DEN-SHOR INC

C/O Shoreco Enterprises Inc 3724 Fm 1960 West #124

Houston, TX 77068

RAJA NADIM NASIR

Houston, TX 77057

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCFARLAND CHARLES BLACK

Attorney at JOYCE MCFARLAND MCFARLAND LLP

712 Main Street, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

MCFARLAND, CHARLES BLACK

Attorney at MCFARLAND PLLC

712 Main Street, Suite 1500

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

Duplechain, Paul R

440 Louisiana, Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Hamilton, Jim D

7700 San Felipe, Suite 550

Houston, TX 77063

 

Court Documents

Oath of Special Commissioner

Oath of Special Commissioner

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

Notice

Notice: NOTICE OF CHANGED OF CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CHARLES MCFARLAND Film code number CCCL-2015-16396

Award

Award: AWARD FILED FEBRUARY 19, 2015 IN THE AMOUNT OF: $100.00 Film code number CCCL-2015-88494

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS - INDEPENDENCE BANK, N/A Film code number CCCL-2015-81100

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS - LISTER MANAGEMENT CORPORATION Film code number CCCL-2015-81114

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS - ELLYH D. AUSTIN Film code number CCCL-2015-81115

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS - P2H2 INVESTMENTS, LLC Film code number CCCL-2015-106566

Motion

Motion: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-167018

Order

Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-354849

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS FAXED TO MELISSA SPINKS Film code number CCCL-2015-66039

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS - PAUL R. DUPLECHAIN Film code number CCCL-2015-81088

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS - RAJA NADIM NASIR Film code number CCCL-2015-81095

Funds to Registry of Court

Funds to Registry of Court: TO BE DEPOSITED INTO THE REGISTRY OF THE COURT (AWARD) $100.00 Film code number CCCL-2015-133191

Notice

Notice: OF DEPOSIT Film code number CCCL-2015-135322

Motion

Motion: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-168266

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment and Notice After Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-168266

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion: FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Film code number CCCL-2015-167018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & JUDGMENT IN THE ABSCENCE OF OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS' AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & JUDGMENT IN THE ABSENCE OF OBJECTIONS TO THE SPECIAL COMMISSIONER'S AWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2015
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice: OF DEPOSIT Film code number CCCL-2015-135322

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • Electronic Filing Fee: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee: NOTICE OF HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Crt 3-Order for Trial Setting-Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Oath of Special Commissioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS Film code number CCCL-2014-354849

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • Electronic Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • RECEIVABLE GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Initiation Event (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Harris County Municipal Utility District No. 213-A is a litigant

Latest cases where INDEPENDENT BANK is a litigant