Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 02/14/2021 at 14:33:10 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 VS MB HOUSTON TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP,JACK IN THE BOX INC.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 61 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MB HOUSTON TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP,JACK IN THE BOX INC. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4021

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Harris County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

Defendants

MB HOUSTON TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

JACK IN THE BOX INC.

C/O Corporation Service Company 211 E 7Th Street Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Commissioners

Danyahel Michael Norris

Manpreet K Singh

Lahoma City, OK 73125

ROGDRICK LAMONZE MANOR

Houston, TX 77004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN

Attorney at SMITH, MURDAUGH, LITTLE & BONHAM, LLP

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

 

Court Documents

2021-01-29 First Amended Petition - 12.pdf

Amended Petition: FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

2021-01-29 Amended Order Appointing SCs - 12.pdf

Proposed Order: AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Spec Comm--sent to judge

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

2021-01-21 Petition and Statement - 12.pdf

eFile Original Petition: AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

2021-01-21 Notice of Hearing - 12.pdf

Notice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

2021-01-21 Oath of SCs - 12.pdf

Oath: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-01-21 Order Appointing SCs - 12.pdf

Proposed Order: APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-01-21 Order Setting Hearing Before SCs - 12.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOath: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases where JACK IN THE BOX INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN