This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/10/2021 at 15:18:39 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 VS MB HOUSTON TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 61 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MB HOUSTON TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LASHAWN WILLIAMS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4316

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Harris County Civil Courts

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LASHAWN WILLIAMS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61

Defendant

MB HOUSTON TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O C Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Commissioners

WILLIAM DAVID MCLEOD

Houston, TX 77257

MANPREET SINGH

Houston, TX 77095

MYNOR EDUARDO RODRIGUEZ

Houston, TX 77004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN

Attorney at SMITH, MURDAUGH, LITTLE & BONHAM, LLP

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS

808 Nueces Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement: Barron, Adler, Clough & Oddo, L.L.P., Trustee for MB Houston Eldridge Town Center Limited Partnership

Order to Withdraw Funds---Sent to Judge

Order to Withdraw Funds

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

2021_07_14 M2W w Ex 1 [PAR 21].pdf

Motion: DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS & proposed ORDER

2021_07_14 proposed Order on M2W (PAR 21).pdf

Motion: DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS & proposed ORDER

2021_07_14 Notice of Submission (PAR 21).pdf

Notice of Submission: ***NOT SET DEAD WEEK FOR COURT 3, CALL COURT FOR DATES

2021_07_20 POS of NOS w Exs 1-3 [PAR 21].pdf

Proof: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF SUBMISSION

1164316 Disclaimer of Interest

Notice: Disclaimer of Interest--Taxing Authority

2021_07_28 AMENDED NOS (PAR 21).pdf

Amended Notice of Submission: FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF SUBMISSION

2021-02-01 First Amended Petition - 21.pdf

Amended Petition: First Amended Petition

2021-02-01 Amended Order Appointing SCs - 21.pdf

Proposed Order: Amended Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners: amended

Amended Order Appointing Spec Com--sent to judge

Order Appointing Special Commissioners: amended

2021-01-27 Petition and Statement - 21.pdf

eFile Original Petition: PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

2021-01-27 Notice of Hearing - 21.pdf

Proposed Order: NOTICE OF HEARING

2021-01-27 Oath of SCs - 21.pdf

Proposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-01-27 Order Appointing SCs - 21.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-01-27 Order Setting Hearing Before SCs - 21.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement: Barron, Adler, Clough & Oddo, L.L.P., Trustee for MB Houston Eldridge Town Center Limited Partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Submission: FIRST AMENDED NOTICE OF SUBMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: Disclaimer of Interest--Taxing Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF SUBMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion: DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS & proposed ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission: ***NOT SET DEAD WEEK FOR COURT 3, CALL COURT FOR DATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: OF DEPOSIT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance: OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Amended Order Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS