This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/21/2021 at 17:26:48 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 VS MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER,PANERA BREAD COMPANY,THE CAIN HOLDING GROUP ELDRIDGE LP

Case Summary

On 02/09/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 61 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER,PANERA BREAD COMPANY,THE CAIN HOLDING GROUP ELDRIDGE LP. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4901

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61

Defendants

THE CAIN HOLDING GROUP ELDRIDGE LP

C/O Charles Cain 25003 Pitkin Road, Suite B100

Spring, TX 77386

MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER

C/O Ct Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

PANERA BREAD COMPANY

C/O Csc-Lawyers Incorporating Service Company 221 Bolivar Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101

EYM Cafe, LP

C/O Corporation Service Company D/B/A Csc - Lawyers 211 E. 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

Commissioners

Dennis Shelton

Baytown, TX 77521

Stanley P Santire

Houston, TX 77063

MARY HUNNELL SMITH

Houston, TX 77024

Not Classified By Court

Michael S Narsete

Houston, TX 77056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN

Attorney at SMITH, MURDAUGH, LITTLE & BONHAM, LLP

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS

808 Nueces Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

1164901 Disclaimer of Interest

Disclaimer: of Interest on Partial Condemnation- Taxing Authorities

APPROVED ORDER TO WITHDRAW FUNDS TO JUDGE.pdf

Order to Withdraw Funds: sent to cc's 8/6

2021-07-13 Notice of Deposit - 22.pdf

Notice: of Deposit

2021_07_15 M2W w Ex 1 (PAR 22).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds

2021_07_15 proposed Order on M2W (PAR 22).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds

2021_07_15 NOS (PAR 22).pdf

Notice of Submission

2021-05-12 Waiver of Service - 22.pdf

Notice: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE & WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS OF DEFENDANT

2021-03-24 First Amended Petition - 22.pdf

Amended Petition: FIRST

2021_03_25 NOA (PAR 22).pdf

Notice of Appearance

2021-04-16 12-25.pdf

Proposed Order: Award of Special Commissioners- submiteed 4/20

AWARD OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS AND SET FEES TO JUDGE.pdf

Award: of Special Commissioners w/Fees

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS TO JUDGE.pdf

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

2021-02-09 Petition and Statement - 22.pdf

eFile Original Petition: CONDEMNATION

2021-02-09 Order Appointing SCs - 22.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS--SUBMITTED 2/9

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds: sent to cc's 8/6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer: of Interest on Partial Condemnation- Taxing Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE & WAIVER OF FORMAL SERVICE OF PROCESS OF DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners w/Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: Award of Special Commissioners- submiteed 4/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAward: of Special Commissioners w/Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS--SUBMITTED 2/9

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases where Panera Bread Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS