This case was last updated from Harris County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 15:35:04 (UTC).

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 VS MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP,JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO 61 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP,JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Harris County Courts, Harris County Civil Courts located in Harris, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLEY BRIONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4319

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Harris, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

LESLEY BRIONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61

Defendants

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

C/O C T Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O C T Corporation System 1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

Commissioners

Rachel Barzilay

Valerie Rosmarin

Sharon Amos

JEFFREY R. NEWPORT

Houston, TX 77024

PRUDENCE NICOLE SMITH

Houston, TX 77004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RADICH, PAUL STEPHEN

Attorney at SMITH, MURDAUGH, LITTLE & BONHAM, LLP

2727 Allen Parkway, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77019

Defendant Attorney

BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS

808 Nueces Street

Austin, TX 78701

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Withdrawal

Certificate of Withdrawal

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

Affidavit of Check Disbursement

APPROVED ORDER TO WITHDRAW AWARD.pdf

Order to Withdraw Funds: sent to cc's 8/4/21

1164319 Disclaimer of Interest

Notice: of Disclaimer of Interest-taxing authorites

Notice of Deposit

Notice: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

2021_07_15 M2W w Ex 1 (PAR 16).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds

2021_07_15 proposed Order on M2W (PAR 16).pdf

Motion to Withdraw Funds

2021_07_15 Notice of Submission (PAR 16).pdf

Notice of Submission

Notices Returned

Notices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners w/Fees

2021-01-29 Amended Order Appointing SCs - 16.pdf

Proposed Order: submitted 2/1---2/1 l/m with Mr. Radich need new order appt. so Judge can appoint 3 more new commissioners. ---AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMM. TO JUDGE.pdf

Order Appointing Special Commissioners

2021-01-27 Petition and Statement - 16.pdf

eFile Original Petition: PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

2021-01-27 Notice of Hearing - 16.pdf

Proposed Order: NOTICE OF HEARING

2021-01-27 Oath of SCs - 16.pdf

Proposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

2021-01-27 Order Appointing SCs - 16.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS--SUBMITTED TO JUDGE 1/27

2021-01-27 Order Setting Hearing Before SCs - 16.pdf

Proposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Withdrawal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Check Disbursement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds: sent to cc's 8/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: of Disclaimer of Interest-taxing authorites

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Withdraw Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT FOR POSSESSION OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners w/Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners w/Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotices Returned: Award of Special Commissioners w/Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners: *Amended*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Petition: FIRST AMENDED PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: submitted 2/1---2/1 l/m with Mr. Radich need new order appt. so Judge can appoint 3 more new commissioners. ---AMENDED ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition (OCA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeFile Original Petition: PETITION AND STATEMENT IN CONDEMNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: OATH OF SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS--SUBMITTED TO JUDGE 1/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order: ORDER SETTING HEARING BEFORE SPECIAL COMMISSIONERS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MB HOUSTON ELDRIDGE TOWN CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where HARRIS COUNTY FRESH WATER SUPPLY DISTRICT NO. 61 is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROOKS, SEJINCURTIS